Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | File Number 481 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 320 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Change of Reference Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |