Senate | 04/18/2016 | File Number 658 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 425 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |