Senate | 04/19/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | File Number 523 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 330 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |