Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Public Act 16-127
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
House Calendar Number 572
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5789
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
File Number 636
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 409
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|