Senate | 04/25/2016 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | File Number 642 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 415 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Public Hearing 03/23 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |