House
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Line Item Vetoed by the Governor, Section(s): Sec. 1 Pg. 11, Sec. 1 Pg. 15, Sec. 1 Pg 23
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Public Act 16-2
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 6497
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 6496
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6491
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6487
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 6418
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 6418
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 6396
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 6409
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6410
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6412
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6404
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Emergency Certification
|
|
|