Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Adopted, House as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
House Calendar Number 582
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Adopted, Senate As Amended by Senate A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6100
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
File Number 582
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 369
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|