Senate | 03/16/2016 | Resolution Withdrawn | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | File Number 6 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 58 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Unfavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office - Unfavorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2016 | Motion Failed SF | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2016 | Filed with Senate Clerks |