Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SR00011 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Senate Resolution No. 11
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 3565
33 *03565__________*
44 Referred to Committee on No Committee
55 Introduced by:
66 SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist.
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Senate Resolution No. 11
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 3565
1515
1616 *03565__________*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on No Committee
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist.
2323
2424 RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE UNITED STATES SENATE TO CONDUCT CONFIRMATION HEARINGS FOR THE PRESIDENT'S NOMINEE TO FILL THE VACANCY ON THE UNITED STATES SUPREME COURT.
2525
2626 Resolved by the Senate:
2727
2828 WHEREAS, Article III of the United States Constitution establishes "the judicial Power of the United States" and, specifically, "one supreme Court"; and
2929
3030 WHEREAS, pursuant to said Article III, the judicial power extends to all "Cases" arising under federal law and to any "Controversies", including, but not limited to, Controversies to which the United States is a party, Controversies between two or more States and Controversies between the citizens of different States; and
3131
3232 WHEREAS, pursuant to said Article III, Justices of the United States Supreme Court "hold their Offices during good Behaviour", meaning each Justice's appointment to the Court is for life, unless such Justice resigns from the Court or is removed by impeachment; and
3333
3434 WHEREAS, on February 13, 2016, Associate Justice of the United States Supreme Court Antonin Scalia passed away; and
3535
3636 WHEREAS, the passing of Justice Scalia left a vacancy on the Court, reducing the number of Justices on the Court from nine to eight; and
3737
3838 WHEREAS, Article II of the United States Constitution provides that the President of the United States "shall nominate, and by and with the Advice and Consent of the Senate, shall appoint . . . Judges of the supreme Court"; and
3939
4040 WHEREAS, the President of the United States has nominated Merrick Garland, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, who "has earned a track record of building consensus as a thoughtful, fair-minded judge who follows the law" and who received bipartisan support during his confirmation to said court in 1997; and
4141
4242 WHEREAS, the majority leadership of the United States Senate has stated that the Senate will neither conduct any confirmation hearings for nor hold any vote on any Supreme Court Justice nominee put forth by the current President of the United States for the purpose of filling the vacancy left by the passing of Justice Scalia until after the 2016 presidential election; and
4343
4444 WHEREAS, a majority of the Justices on the Court, by joining in any holding of an opinion, may set forth a rule of law that is binding upon the United States government and the governments of the several States; and
4545
4646 WHEREAS, the state of the law in this country may be uncertain in the absence of nine Justices sitting on the Supreme Court adjudicating the Cases and Controversies that come before the Court; and
4747
4848 WHEREAS, the Court's pending decision in Harris v. Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission, No. 14-232 (argued December 8, 2015), would have far-reaching effects on the electoral reapportionment process and the conduct of elections in Connecticut; and
4949
5050 WHEREAS, the Court's pending decisions in Whole Women's Health v. Hellerstedt, No. 15-274 (argued March 2, 2016), and Zubik v. Burwell, No. 14-1418 (argued March 23, 2016), would significantly impact the reproductive rights of countless Connecticut women; and
5151
5252 WHEREAS, the Court's pending decision on granting certiorari in Shew v. Malloy, 804 F.3d 242 (2d Cir. 2015) (petition filed February 16, 2016, No. 15-1030), involves Connecticut's 2013 gun control legislation, enacted in the wake of horrific tragedy and with the goal of, among other things, restricting access to certain dangerous firearms; and
5353
5454 WHEREAS, the rulings on these and any other such Cases and Controversies may be less decisive and more susceptible to deadlock on important legal issues in the absence of nine Justices sitting on the Supreme Court; and
5555
5656 WHEREAS, on March 22, 2016, only thirty-eight days after the passing of Justice Scalia, the Court has already issued an evenly-split decision; and
5757
5858 WHEREAS, inaction by the United States Senate should not override the nation's need and desire for a clear, sound and stable body of law.
5959
6060 NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED, that the Connecticut Senate respectfully memorializes the United States Senate to hold confirmation hearings on the Supreme Court Justice nominee put forth by the President of the United States, confirm any such qualified nominee and thereby appoint such qualified nominee to fill the vacancy on the United States Supreme Court, in accordance with Article II of the United States Constitution; and
6161
6262 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, that the clerk of the Connecticut Senate cause a copy of this resolution to be transmitted to the President of the United States; the Vice President of the United States, in his capacity as presiding officer of the United States Senate and addressed to him in the office he maintains at the United States Capitol Building; the President Pro Tempore of the United States Senate; the Majority Leader of the United States Senate; and the Minority Leader of the United States Senate.