Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05116 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Substitute House Bill No. 5116
1+General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5116
2+January Session, 2017 *_____HB05116HED___032117____*
23
3-Public Act No. 17-156
4+General Assembly
45
5-AN ACT CONCERNING PUBLIC ACCESS TO HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT DATA.
6+Substitute Bill No. 5116
7+
8+January Session, 2017
9+
10+*_____HB05116HED___032117____*
11+
12+AN ACT CONCERNING A HIGHER EDUCATION DATA COLLECTION AND TRACKING SYSTEM.
613
714 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
815
9-Section 1. Subsection (c) of section 10a-6b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):
16+Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2017) (a) The constituent units of the state system of higher education, as defined in section 10a-1 of the general statutes, and the Labor Department, shall collect data as described in subsections (b) and (d) of this section. Such data shall be made accessible to the public on or before October 1, 2018, by means of an Internet web site, to assist students with making informed decisions concerning higher education and career choices. For the purposes of this section, "degree" means associate degree, bachelor's degree, master's degree and doctorate degree.
1017
11-(c) The council shall work with the Labor Department and utilize existing data networks to (1) produce periodic reports, capable of being sorted by student age, on the employment status, job retention and earnings of students enrolled in academic and noncredit vocational courses and programs, both prior to enrollment and after completion of such courses and programs, who leave the constituent units upon graduation or otherwise, and (2) develop an annual affordability index for public higher education that is based on state-wide median family income. Such reports shall be made accessible on an Internet web site in aggregate form with guidance from the Planning Commission for Higher Education.
18+(b) Not later than January 1, 2018, the constituent units shall provide data to the Labor Department, for the previous ten academic years, relating to sub-baccalaureate certificate and degree completion, including, but not limited to, (1) the number of students that have completed a sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program currently offered at an institution within the constituent units, (2) the subject matter of the sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program completed by such students, (3) the degrees earned by such students, (4) the institutions at which such students received sub-baccalaureate certificates or degrees, and (5) the year of completion of such sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program.
19+
20+(c) Not later than January 1, 2019, and annually thereafter, the constituent units shall collect data, as described in subsection (b) of this section, for the previous academic year, and provide such data to the Labor Department.
21+
22+(d) Not later than July 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, the Labor Department shall collect data relating to the salaries of students who have completed a sub-baccalaureate certificate or degree program at an institution within the constituent units, including, but not limited to, the salaries of such students one year after completion, five years after completion and ten years after completion. The Labor Department shall pair such salary data with the corresponding sub-baccalaureate certificate and degree program completion data.
23+
24+(e) Not later than October 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, the Labor Department shall make such paired data accessible on an Internet web site in aggregate form.
25+
26+(f) The constituent units and the Labor Department may utilize existing data collection networks to implement the provisions of this section.
27+
28+(g) Each public institution of higher education shall post a link to access such data on the institution's Internet web site.
29+
30+
31+
32+
33+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
34+Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section
35+
36+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
37+
38+Section 1
39+
40+July 1, 2017
41+
42+New section
43+
44+
45+
46+HED Joint Favorable Subst.
47+
48+HED
49+
50+Joint Favorable Subst.