House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Vote to Draft |