House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Public Hearing 01/30 | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |