House | 05/09/2017 | File Number 730 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 112 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 107 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 01/25/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |