House | 05/18/2017 | Bill Passed Temporary | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | File Number 487 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 328 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |