House
|
06/27/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Special Act 17-9
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
File Number 783
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 488
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7400
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 488
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
House Calendar Number 329
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|