House | 06/30/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2017 | Public Act 17-110 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 259 | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | File Number 347 | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | House Calendar Number 253 | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Vote to Draft |