House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 314 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 229 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 |