House | 04/11/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | File Number 215 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 168 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |