House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 251 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 191 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |