House | 06/02/2017 | House Recommitted to Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | File Number 52 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 68 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Vote to Draft |