Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05871 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/04/2017

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5871
January Session, 2017  *_____HB05871ENV___032117____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 5871 

January Session, 2017

*_____HB05871ENV___032117____*

AN ACT PROVIDING FUNDING FOR SOIL AND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICTS. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 22a-27j of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017):

(a) Any person, firm or corporation, other than a municipality, making an application for any approval required by chapters 124, 126, 440 and 444 or by regulations adopted pursuant to said chapters shall pay a fee of twenty dollars, in addition to any other fee which may be required, to the municipal agency or legislative body which is authorized to approve the application. On and after October 1, 2009, the fee shall be sixty dollars. Such municipal agency or legislative body shall collect such fees, retaining [two] four dollars of each such fee for administrative costs, and shall pay thirty dollars of each such fee to the Council on Soil and Water Conservation, established pursuant to section 22a-315, on a quarterly basis, and pay the remainder of each such [fees quarterly] fee, on a quarterly basis, to the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection [and the receipts shall be deposited] for deposit into the General Fund. All fees received by the Council on Soil and Water Conservation pursuant to this section shall be used by such council to equally fund the work of each soil and water conservation district established pursuant to section 22a-315. 

(b) Not later than three months following the close of each fiscal year starting with the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2000, the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection shall identify those municipalities that are not in compliance with subsection (a) of this section for the previous fiscal year and shall provide the Office of Policy and Management with a list of such municipalities. The list shall be submitted annually and in such manner as the Office of Policy and Management may require. The Office of Policy and Management, when issuing the first payment from the Mashantucket Pequot and Mohegan Fund established pursuant to section 3-55i, in the fiscal year during which said list is received, shall reduce said payment to a municipality by one thousand dollars for each quarter of the preceding fiscal year that the municipality has not been in compliance with subsection (a) of this section to a maximum of four thousand dollars in each fiscal year.

(c) Following the close of each fiscal year starting with the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall certify to the Comptroller the amount of any funds withheld under subsection (b) of this section and the Comptroller shall cause such amount to be deposited into the General Fund. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2017 22a-27j

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2017

22a-27j

 

ENV Joint Favorable Subst.

ENV

Joint Favorable Subst.