House | 07/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2017 | Public Act 17-113 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 260 | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | File Number 22 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 50 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Vote to Draft |