House | 07/07/2017 | Vetoed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/19/2017 | Public Act 17-159 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/26/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 544 | ||
House | 05/26/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | File Number 731 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 492 | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |