Senate | 05/31/2017 | File Number 809 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 560 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8070 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | File Number 67 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | House Calendar Number 79 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |