House | 04/11/2017 | File Number 490 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 331 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |