House
|
05/16/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Public Act 17-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
File Number 681
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6254
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 491
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
House Calendar Number 332
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|