House
|
07/05/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-115
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
File Number 769
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 460
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6882
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
File Number 492
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
House Calendar Number 333
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|