House
|
07/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-161
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
File Number 801
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 545
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7808
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
File Number 282
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
House Calendar Number 212
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|