House | 05/25/2017 | File Number 792 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 527 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7453 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | File Number 43 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 61 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/08 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Vote to Draft |