House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 622 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8858 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 254 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 194 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |