House | 04/06/2017 | File Number 449 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | House Calendar Number 310 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |