House | 07/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2017 | Public Act 17-116 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 442 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 284 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 214 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee |