House | 03/21/2017 | File Number 95 | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | House Calendar Number 97 | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |