House | 06/20/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Special Act 17-6 | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 529 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 119 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 114 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |