Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 570 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8356 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | File Number 451 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | House Calendar Number 312 | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |