House | 03/28/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | File Number 55 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 71 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Vote to Draft |