House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Vote to Draft |