House
|
07/05/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2017
|
Public Act 17-208
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 597
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8616
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8559
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
File Number 44
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
House Calendar Number 62
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|