House | 07/07/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/23/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/19/2017 | Public Act 17-167 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 479 | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 256 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 196 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |