House | 04/25/2017 | No Action | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 257 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 197 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |