House | 03/27/2017 | File Number 218 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 171 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Change of Reference to Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 01/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |