House | 04/26/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 580 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 382 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |