Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06456 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 6456
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 2449
33 *02449*
44 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
55 Introduced by:
66 REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist. REP. ADAMS, 146th Dist. REP. ARCE, 4th Dist. REP. BARAM, 15th Dist. REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist. REP. D'AGOSTINO, 91st Dist. REP. DE LA CRUZ, 41st Dist. REP. DIMASSA, 116th Dist. REP. ELLIOTT, 88th Dist. REP. GENTILE, 104th Dist. REP. GODFREY, 110th Dist. REP. HADDAD, 54th Dist. REP. HENNESSY, 127th Dist. REP. JOHNSON, 49th Dist. REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist. REP. LESSER, 100th Dist. REP. LOPES, 24th Dist. REP. MORIN, 28th Dist. REP. MUSHINSKY, 85th Dist. REP. ORANGE, 48th Dist. REP. PAOLILLO, 97th Dist. REP. PORTER, 94th Dist. REP. RILEY, 46th Dist. REP. ROSARIO, 128th Dist. REP. ROSE, 118th Dist. REP. RYAN, 139th Dist. REP. SANCHEZ, 25th Dist. REP. SANTIAGO, 84th Dist. REP. SANTIAGO, 130th Dist. REP. SCANLON, 98th Dist. REP. SOTO, 39th Dist. REP. STAFSTROM, 129th Dist. REP. STALLWORTH, 126th Dist. REP. TERCYAK, 26th Dist. REP. URBAN, 43rd Dist. REP. VARGAS, 6th Dist. REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist. REP. WINKLER, 56th Dist. SEN. FLEXER, 29th Dist. SEN. GERRATANA, 6th Dist. SEN. GOMES, 23rd Dist. SEN. KENNEDY, 12th Dist. SEN. MOORE, 22nd Dist. SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Proposed Bill No. 6456
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 2449
1515
1616 *02449*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist.
2323
2424 REP. ADAMS, 146th Dist.
2525
2626 REP. ARCE, 4th Dist.
2727
2828 REP. BARAM, 15th Dist.
2929
3030 REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist.
3131
3232 REP. D'AGOSTINO, 91st Dist.
3333
3434 REP. DE LA CRUZ, 41st Dist.
3535
3636 REP. DIMASSA, 116th Dist.
3737
3838 REP. ELLIOTT, 88th Dist.
3939
4040 REP. GENTILE, 104th Dist.
4141
4242 REP. GODFREY, 110th Dist.
4343
4444 REP. HADDAD, 54th Dist.
4545
4646 REP. HENNESSY, 127th Dist.
4747
4848 REP. JOHNSON, 49th Dist.
4949
5050 REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist.
5151
5252 REP. LESSER, 100th Dist.
5353
5454 REP. LOPES, 24th Dist.
5555
5656 REP. MORIN, 28th Dist.
5757
5858 REP. MUSHINSKY, 85th Dist.
5959
6060 REP. ORANGE, 48th Dist.
6161
6262 REP. PAOLILLO, 97th Dist.
6363
6464 REP. PORTER, 94th Dist.
6565
6666 REP. RILEY, 46th Dist.
6767
6868 REP. ROSARIO, 128th Dist.
6969
7070 REP. ROSE, 118th Dist.
7171
7272 REP. RYAN, 139th Dist.
7373
7474 REP. SANCHEZ, 25th Dist.
7575
7676 REP. SANTIAGO, 84th Dist.
7777
7878 REP. SANTIAGO, 130th Dist.
7979
8080 REP. SCANLON, 98th Dist.
8181
8282 REP. SOTO, 39th Dist.
8383
8484 REP. STAFSTROM, 129th Dist.
8585
8686 REP. STALLWORTH, 126th Dist.
8787
8888 REP. TERCYAK, 26th Dist.
8989
9090 REP. URBAN, 43rd Dist.
9191
9292 REP. VARGAS, 6th Dist.
9393
9494 REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.
9595
9696 REP. WINKLER, 56th Dist.
9797
9898 SEN. FLEXER, 29th Dist.
9999
100100 SEN. GERRATANA, 6th Dist.
101101
102102 SEN. GOMES, 23rd Dist.
103103
104104 SEN. KENNEDY, 12th Dist.
105105
106106 SEN. MOORE, 22nd Dist.
107107
108108 SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.
109109
110110 AN ACT INCREASING THE MINIMUM FAIR WAGE.
111111
112112 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
113113
114114 That section 31-58 of the general statutes be amended to increase the minimum fair wage to eleven dollars per hour, effective January 1, 2018, to twelve dollars per hour, effective January 1, 2019, to thirteen dollars per hour, effective January 1, 2020, to fourteen dollars per hour, effective January 1, 2021, and to fifteen dollars per hour, effective January 1, 2022.
115115
116116 Statement of Purpose:
117117
118118 To establish a minimum wage of fifteen dollars per hour in the State of Connecticut.