House | 05/04/2017 | File Number 718 | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 405 | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6233 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 581 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 383 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |