House | 04/21/2017 | File Number 682 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 377 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6263 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 317 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 232 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/06/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |