Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06551 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Committee Bill No. 6551
22 January Session, 2017 LCO No. 6326
3- *_____HB06551FIN___042817____*
3+ *06326HB06551FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Committee Bill No. 6551
1111
1212 January Session, 2017
1313
1414 LCO No. 6326
1515
16-*_____HB06551FIN___042817____*
16+*06326HB06551FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING A STUDY OF CONSUMER ACCESS TO MARIJUANA FOR PALLIATIVE USE.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2017) (a) There is established a task force to study consumer access to marijuana for palliative use and evaluate whether such access is sufficient to satisfy the demand in the state and whether the prices charged to qualifying patients for such marijuana are reasonably related to the costs of producing and dispensing such marijuana. The study shall include, but not be limited to, (1) the process by which qualifying patients select a licensed dispensary, (2) the number of qualifying patients in the state and the number and locations of licensed dispensaries and licensed producers in the state, and whether such numbers and locations are sufficient and accessible to satisfy the demand for marijuana for palliative use in the state, (3) the prices charged to qualifying patients for marijuana for palliative use, (4) the operating expenses, administrative costs and other factors included in the calculation of the prices charged to qualifying patients, and (5) an evaluation of whether such prices are reasonable given the expenses, costs and factors under subdivision (4) of this subsection.
2929
3030 (b) The task force shall consist of the following members:
3131
3232 (1) Two members appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives, one of whom shall be an economist from the Barney School of Business at the University of Hartford and one of whom shall be a licensed producer;
3333
3434 (2) Two members appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one of whom shall have expertise in finance from the Yale School of Management and one of whom shall be a licensed dispensary;
3535
3636 (3) Two members appointed by the Republican president pro tempore of the Senate, one of whom shall be a licensed producer and one of whom shall be a licensed dispensary;
3737
3838 (4) One member appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives, who shall be a qualifying patient;
3939
4040 (5) The director of the Department of Consumer Protection Drug Control Division; and
4141
4242 (6) The Commissioner of Consumer Protection, or the commissioner's designee.
4343
4444 (c) (1) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than August 1, 2017. Any vacancy shall be filled by the appointing authority.
4545
4646 (2) The speaker of the House of Representatives, the president pro tempore of the Senate and the Republican president pro tempore of the Senate shall select the chairpersons of the task force from among the members of the task force. Such chairpersons shall schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than September 1, 2017.
4747
4848 (d) The administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to consumer protection shall serve as administrative staff of the task force.
4949
5050 (e) Not later than February 1, 2018, the task force shall submit a report on its findings and recommendations, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to consumer protection. The task force shall terminate on the date that it submits such report or October 1, 2018, whichever is later.
5151
5252 (f) As used in this section, "qualifying patient", "licensed dispensary" and "licensed producer" have the same meanings as provided in section 21a-408 of the general statutes.
5353
5454
5555
5656
5757 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5858 Section 1 July 1, 2017 New section
5959
6060 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6161
6262 Section 1
6363
6464 July 1, 2017
6565
6666 New section
6767
68+Statement of Purpose:
69+
70+To establish a task force to study consumer access to marijuana for palliative use and to evaluate supply, demand and pricing of such marijuana.
71+
72+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
6873
6974
70-FIN Joint Favorable
7175
72-FIN
76+Co-Sponsors: REP. CANDELORA, 86th Dist.
7377
74-Joint Favorable
78+Co-Sponsors:
79+
80+REP. CANDELORA, 86th Dist.
81+
82+H.B. 6551