House | 03/22/2017 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Change of Reference to Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 01/26/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |