Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Special Act 17-19
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8348
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6655
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 121
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
House Calendar Number 116
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|