House | 03/23/2017 | File Number 175 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | House Calendar Number 144 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Vote to Draft |