House | 04/07/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 318 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 233 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |